Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Ndaka Salabisala

Auxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Titular Bishop of Liberalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1973 Born
9 Sep 200128.6Ordained PriestPriest of Popokabaka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Jun 202047.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Jun 202047.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Liberalia
10 Oct 202047.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Liberalia

MicroData Summary for Charles Ndaka Salabisala
Bishop Charles Ndaka Salabisala (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePopokabaka, Diocese of Popokabaka
Ordained BishopGrounds of, l'Institut Technique de la Gombe, Kinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Kinshasa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Aug 2020
  • c3: CB, 10 Oct 2020
  • c4: CB, 11 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 12 Oct 2020

Quantcast