Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donatien Bafuidinsoni Maloko-Mana, S.J.

Bishop of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1962 Born
18 Jul 199330.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
24 Mar 200138.2Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
31 Mar 201552.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 Mar 201552.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
7 Jun 201552.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
31 Mar 201855.3AppointedBishop of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Donatien Bafuidinsoni Maloko-Mana (VIAF: 68278288)
Bishop Donatien Bafuidinsoni Maloko-Mana S.J. (born ) Bishop of Inongo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinshasa, Archdiocese of Léopoldville
Ordained BishopPalais du Peuple, Kinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Inongo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2015
  • ln/sole: CB, 1 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 28 Apr 2015
  • c34: CB, 8 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,502
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast