Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Wróbel, S.C.I.

Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

Titular Bishop of Suas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1952 BornBestwina, Poland
28 Dec 197422.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
12 Jun 198027.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
30 Nov 200048.1AppointedBishop of Helsinki, Finland
27 Jan 200148.2Ordained BishopBishop of Helsinki, Finland
28 Jun 200855.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
28 Jun 200855.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Suas

MicroData Summary for Józef Wróbel:
Bishop Józef Wróbel S.C.I. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lublin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,890

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015