Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Wember, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Vasada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1900BornDortmund, Germany
8 Aug 192625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
17 Nov 193939.0AppointedSuperior of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}
10 Mar 194443.3AppointedPrefect of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}
18 Feb 195554.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}
18 Feb 195554.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vasada
15 May 195554.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vasada
1 Mar 197675.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}
4 May 198079.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}

MicroData Summary for Johann Wember:
Bishop Johann Wember M.S.F. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013