Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Erik Varden, O.C.S.O.

Prelate of Trondheim, Norway


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1974 Born
Jun 1993³19.0Converted
20 Apr 200227.9EnteredMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
1 Oct 200430.3ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
6 Oct 200733.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
9 Sep 201036.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
16 Jul 201137.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
1 Oct 201945.3AppointedPrelate of Trondheim, Norway
4 Jan 202045.6Ordained BishopPrelate of Trondheim, Norway

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Erik Varden
Father Erik Varden O.C.S.O. (born ) Prelate of Trondheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarpsborg, Diocese of Oslo
Ordained BishopNidarosdomen (Lutheran), Cathedral, Trondheim, Territorial Prelature of Trondheim

Please contact the Father through the Territorial Prelature of Trondheim.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2019
  • prof/od/c01/ob: CB, 1 Oct 2019
  • ob: CB, 8 Oct 2019
  • c2+: CB, 9 Oct 2019
  • ob.loc: CB, 1 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 4 Nov 2019

Quantcast