Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Czeslaw Kozon

Bishop of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1951 BornSonder Tastrup-Sud Falster
6 Jan 197927.1Ordained PriestPriest of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}, Denmark
22 Mar 199543.3AppointedBishop of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}, Denmark
7 May 199543.5Ordained BishopBishop of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}, Denmark

MicroData Summary for Czeslaw Kozon:
Bishop Czeslaw Kozon (born ) Bishop of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of KÝbenhavn {Copenhagen}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,550

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Feb 2014