Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karlheinz Diez

Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

Titular Bishop of Villa Regis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1954 BornFreigericht-Horbach
19 Mar 197723.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Fulda, Germany
10 Oct 197824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fulda, Germany
13 Jul 200450.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
13 Jul 200450.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Villa Regis
26 Sep 200450.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villa Regis

MicroData Summary for Karlheinz Diez:
Bishop Karlheinz Diez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fulda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,696
  • od/c01: CB, 11 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Feb 2014