Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Maria Buglione

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1853Born
1 Apr 187622.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 189137.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
1 Jun 189137.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Daulia
7 Jun 189137.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daulia
11 Sep 189441.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
11 Sep 189441.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Ponti
18 Oct 189643.1SucceededArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
20 Feb 190450.5DiedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Buglione (VIAF: 88855208)
Archbishop Antonio Maria Buglione (born , died ) Archbishop of Conza e Campagna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonteverde, Diocese of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 166, and Page 219
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 240
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017