Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Paolo Carrano

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1841Born
24 Sep 186423.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 189150.1AppointedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
7 Jun 189150.1Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
16 Jan 189351.7AppointedArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
1 Sep 190665.4AppointedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
18 Mar 191573.9DiedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Paolo Carrano (VIAF: 90262656)
Archbishop Francesco Paolo Carrano (born , died ) Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 114, and Page 326
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017