Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Alfonso Todisco Grande

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1844Born
21 Dec 186723.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 189247.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
17 Jul 189247.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
12 Jun 189348.5AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
Aug 1896³51.6DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emilio Alfonso Todisco Grande (VIAF: 307406656)
Bishop Emilio Alfonso Todisco Grande (born , died Aug 1896) Bishop of Nusco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBisceglie, Archdiocese of Trani e Nazareth e Bisceglie
Ordained BishopS. Antonio in Via Merulana, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 116, and Page 421
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017