Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Caporali, C.Pp.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1824Born
18 Sep 184723.0Ordained PriestPriest
1851¹26.3ProfessedPriest of Society of Precious Blood
23 Jun 189065.8AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
29 Jun 189065.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
23 Nov 191187.2DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Caporali
Archbishop Gaetano Caporali C.Pp.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel Frentano, Archdiocese of Lanciano
Ordained BishopSt Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017