Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Cassato

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Otranto, Italy

Titular Bishop of Ionopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1833Born
20 Sep 185622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Otranto, Italy
24 Mar 189864.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Otranto, Italy
24 Mar 189864.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
15 May 189864.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
1 May 191379.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Cassato
Bishop Andrea Cassato (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Eufemia, Archdiocese of Otranto
Ordained BishopCathedral, Otranto, Archdiocese of Otranto

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 323
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,898, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast