Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Pugliese

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1850Born
5 Jun 189544.4AppointedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
30 Jun 189544.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
22 Jun 189645.4AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
17 Jul 192372.5DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Pugliese
Bishop Luigi Pugliese (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerignola, Diocese of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 365, and Page 574
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017