Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vito Antonio Fioni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Larino, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1840Born
22 Sep 186626.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188848.3AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
10 Jun 188848.4Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
8 Mar 1891³51.1ResignedBishop of Larino, Italy
1 Jun 189151.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
17 Jan 191676.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Larino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vito Antonio Fioni
Bishop Vito Antonio Fioni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Larino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBitritto, Archdiocese of Bari (-Canosa)
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 334, and Page 518
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017