Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Ricciardi

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1839Born
19 Sep 186324.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Mar 186424.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188848.8AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
10 Jun 188848.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
18 Jun 190868.9DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Ricciardi (VIAF: 10950655)
Bishop Giuseppe Ricciardi (born , died ) Bishop of Nard˛

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaranto, Archdiocese of Taranto
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 410
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1888, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017