Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi del Forno

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1843Born
17 Mar 186622.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 188541.9AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
1 Aug 188541.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
4 Jan 191369.3DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi del Forno
Bishop Luigi del Forno (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017