Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Genovese

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sarepta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1832BornCava de’ Tirreni
20 Sep 185623.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 190068.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
3 Jan 190168.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
16 Dec 190270.1DiedTitular Bishop of Sarepta

MicroData Summary for Filippo Genovese:
Bishop Filippo Genovese (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Sarepta

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 502
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013