Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Izzo

Deceased

Bishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1848Born
22 Sep 187224.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 188941.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
24 May 188941.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
9 Jun 188941.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
3 Apr 189042.0SucceededBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
15 Jan 191465.8DiedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Izzo
Bishop Giuseppe Izzo (born , died ) Bishop of Cava e Sarno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoscotrecase, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSte Restituta, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 194, and Page 304
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017