Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Taglialatela (Tagliatela)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia (e Vieste)

Titular Archbishop of Bostra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1804BornGiuliano
23 Dec 182622.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 185450.2AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
30 Jul 185450.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
7 Dec 187975.7RetiredArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
27 Feb 188075.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bostra
1897¹92.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Taglialatela (Tagliatela):
Archbishop Vincenzo Taglialatela (Tagliatela) (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia (e Vieste)

  • a priest for 70.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 154, and Page 521

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013