Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodovico Caracciolo di Castagneta

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Aversa, Italy

Titular Bishop of Calydon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1847Born
19 Dec 186922.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 188336.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aversa, Italy
9 Aug 188336.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Calydon
16 Sep 188336.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calydon
8 Nov 189043.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Caracciolo di Castagneta
Bishop Lodovico Caracciolo di Castagneta (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSt. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 20.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 174
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017