Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria De Pol

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1836Born
23 Apr 185922.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 188751.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vicenza, Italy
25 Nov 188751.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
8 Dec 188751.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
4 Mar 188851.6AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
4 Jul 189255.9DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria De Pol (VIAF: 307396503)
Bishop Antonio Maria De Pol (born , died ) Bishop of Vicenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSte Agnes-Place Navone, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 422, and Page 589
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017