Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Sbrolli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Naupactus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1828Born
19 Apr 185123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
27 Oct 187143.7AppointedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
1 Nov 187143.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
Jul 1885³57.3ResignedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
27 Jul 188557.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
28 Apr 188860.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sbrolli
Archbishop Antonio Sbrolli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sovana e Pitigliano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiancastagnaio, Diocese of Sovana e Pitigliano
Ordained BishopS. Charles ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 404, and Page 523
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017