Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Maria Maselli, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1834Born
20 Dec 185622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
22 Jun 187743.2AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
29 Jun 187743.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
26 Jul 189056.3DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Maria Maselli
Bishop Gennaro Maria Maselli O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAccadia, Diocese of Bovino
Ordained BishopS. Andre delle Fratte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 574
  • c3: CB, 7 May 2012
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017