Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Maria Valensise

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicastro, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1832Born
24 Mar 186027.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188855.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nicastro, Italy
1 Jun 188855.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
10 Jun 188855.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
7 Mar 189158.2SucceededBishop of Nicastro, Italy
2 Jun 190269.4ResignedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
2 Jun 190269.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus
17 Jan 191683.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Maria Valensise (VIAF: 89451475)
Archbishop Domenico Maria Valensise (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicastro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePolistena, Diocese of Mileto
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 125, and Page 407
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 432
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017