Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ioannis Marang˛ (Marengo)

Deceased

Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

Apostolic Delegate to Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1833Born
9 Mar 185622.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 186532.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tinos, Greece
14 Nov 186532.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mykonos, Greece
14 Nov 186532.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
14 Jan 186632.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
29 Jun 186633.2SucceededBishop of Tinos, Greece
29 Jun 186633.2SucceededBishop of Mykonos, Greece
9 Jun 187441.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Greece
23 Jul 187542.3AppointedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
17 Dec 189158.7DiedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Ioannis Marang˛ (Marengo)
Archbishop Ioannis Marang˛ (Marengo) (born , died ) Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSyros
Ordained BishopTinos, Diocese of Tinos

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 128, and Page 554
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 568
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1866, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017