Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Castelli

Deceased

Bishop of Tinos, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1824Born
13 May 187955.1AppointedBishop of Tinos, Greece
29 Jun 187955.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tinos, Greece
7 Sep 189874.4DiedBishop of Tinos, Greece

MicroData Summary for Michele Castelli (VIAF: 304912148)
Bishop Michele Castelli (born , died ) Bishop of Tinos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIzmir, Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
Ordained BishopIzmir, Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 554
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017