Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Policarpo Timoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1833Born
30 Jul 187542.3AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
8 Sep 187542.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
13 May 187946.1AppointedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
25 Jul 190471.3DiedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Andrea Policarpo Timoni (VIAF: 89514810)
Archbishop Andrea Policarpo Timoni (born , died ) Archbishop of Izmir (Smirne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIzmir, Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Izmir, Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne)

  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 201, and Page 523
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017