Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Galibert

Deceased

Bishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1830Born
4 Feb 187948.8AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
6 Jul 187949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
8 Aug 190676.3DiedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Antonio Galibert
Bishop Antonio Galibert (born , died ) Bishop of Santorini {Thira}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstaninople
Ordained BishopS. Esprit-Pancolte, Constaninople

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 498
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017