Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Nicolaus Giustiniani

Deceased

Bishop of Chios (Scio), Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1819Born
30 Jul 187556.0AppointedBishop of Tinos, Greece
19 Sep 187556.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tinos, Greece
13 May 187959.8AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
26 Oct 188465.2DiedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Nicolaus Giustiniani
Bishop Ignazio Nicolaus Giustiniani (born , died ) Bishop of Chios (Scio)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalaros, Diocese of Chios (Scio)
Ordained BishopSmyrne, Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 201, and Page 554
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1875, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017