Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi M. Cannav˛ (Canavo), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crete {Candia}, Greece

Titular Bishop of Patara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1827Born
26 Jul 185023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Dec 187447.7AppointedBishop of Crete {Candia}, Greece
7 Feb 187547.8Ordained BishopBishop of Crete {Candia}, Greece
17 Feb 1889³61.8ResignedBishop of Crete {Candia}, Greece
10 May 188962.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
27 Aug 190780.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Crete {Candia}, Greece

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi M. Cannav˛ (Canavo)
Bishop Luigi M. Cannav˛ (Canavo) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crete {Candia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastiglione
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Smirne, Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 178, and Page 443
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1875, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017