Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Domenico Reynaudi (Raynaud), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria

Titular Archbishop of Stauropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1808Born
1825¹16.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1831¹22.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Dec 186759.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
17 Dec 186759.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aegae
22 Mar 186859.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aegae
5 May 188576.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
5 May 188576.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
24 Jul 189384.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Domenico Reynaudi (Raynaud)
Archbishop Francesco Domenico Reynaudi (Raynaud) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sofia e Plovdiv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafranca, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Louis des Capucins, Constantinople

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1894
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 79, and Page 528
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017