Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Arachial

Deceased

Bishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1811Born
19 Mar 184432.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 185038.9AppointedBishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey
1 Feb 185240.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey
22 Dec 186352.6AppointedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
5 Sep 187665.3DiedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Arachial
Bishop Giuseppe Arachial (born , died ) Bishop of Ancira (Angora)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncira

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 100, and Page 562
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1852, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016