Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Salviani

Deceased

Bishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)


Events

DateEventTitle
1812¹Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 1855AppointedBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
26 Aug 1855Ordained BishopBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
3 Jun 1865DiedBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannes Salviani
Bishop Joannes Salviani (died ) Bishop of Erzerum (Garin)

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1855, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast