Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teofilo Massucci, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos), Greece

Titular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1819Born
1835¹15.2ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
1842¹22.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
1 Oct 188061.0AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
21 Nov 188061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
18 Feb 189575.4ResignedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
24 Aug 189676.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
10 May 190080.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Teofilo Massucci
Bishop Teofilo Massucci O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Syros (e Milos)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastignano
Ordained BishopPera, Constantinople

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 82, and Page 532
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017