Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Zaloni

Deceased

Bishop of Tinos, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1791Born
15 Feb 184250.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tinos, Greece
15 Feb 184250.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
15 May 184250.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Byblus
7 Jul 184351.6SucceededBishop of Tinos, Greece
29 Jun 186674.6DiedBishop of Tinos, Greece

MicroData Summary for Francesco Zaloni
Bishop Francesco Zaloni (born , died ) Bishop of Tinos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLutra

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 123, and Page 370
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1842, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017