Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Terroni

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1848Born
23 Dec 187123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pontremoli, Italy
22 Jun 190355.0AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
29 Jun 190355.0Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
14 Nov 190355.3InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
28 Aug 190759.1DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Terroni
Bishop Pietro Terroni (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuinadi di Pontremoli

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 164
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018