Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Jacuzio

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1862Born
13 Sep 188522.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 190037.9AppointedBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy
21 Dec 190038.0Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy
9 Jul 191754.5AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
19 May 194481.4DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Jacuzio
Archbishop Paolo Jacuzio (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForino

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast