Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Lorenzo Passerini

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1837BornCortona
22 Sep 186022.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 189254.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
17 Jul 189254.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
18 Apr 190163.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
13 Dec 191578.0DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Passerini:
Patriarch Lorenzo Passerini (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 108, and Page 471

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013