Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dionysius Antonius Schüler, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1854Born
21 Sep 187824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1903²48.6AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
27 Oct 191157.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
5 Nov 191157.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
7 Sep 192672.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionysius Antonius Schüler (VIAF: 31139966)
Archbishop Dionysius Antonius Schüler O.F.M. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchlatt, Germany

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 29 Jan 2019

Quantcast