Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph Farrelly

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1895BornLismore
1 Dec 191823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lismore, Australia
28 Apr 193135.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lismore, Australia
28 Apr 193135.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)
30 Aug 193135.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)
8 May 194953.4SucceededBishop of Lismore, Australia
1 Sep 197175.7RetiredBishop of Lismore, Australia
25 May 197478.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lismore, Australia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Farrelly:
Bishop Patrick Joseph Farrelly (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lismore

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013