Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Cantwell

Deceased

Bishop of Meath


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1792BornRahan
1815²22.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 183037.5AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
21 Sep 183037.7Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland
11 Dec 186673.9DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Cantwell (VIAF: 29486314)
Bishop John Cantwell (born , died ) Bishop of Meath

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Aug 2016