Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Derry

Deceased

Bishop of Clonfert


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1811BornHermitage, Moore
1834¹22.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 184736.1AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
21 Sep 184736.3Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
28 Jun 187059.0DiedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Derry:
Bishop John Derry (born , died ) Bishop of Clonfert

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013