Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Fallon

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmacduagh

Bishop of Kilfenora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1805²BornFahy
182823.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 185348.1AppointedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
28 Jan 185348.1AppointedBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland
1 May 185348.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
13 May 187974.4DiedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Patrick Fallon:
Bishop Patrick Fallon (died ) Bishop of Kilmacduagh

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 252
  • b/c2+: CB, 29 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,731

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013