Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurence Gillooly, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1819Born
1844²24.6EnteredMember of Congregation of the Mission
6 Dec 1847³28.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
29 Feb 185636.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Elphin, Ireland
29 Feb 185636.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Belline
7 Sep 185637.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belline
1 Dec 185839.5SucceededBishop of Elphin, Ireland
15 Jan 1895³75.6DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Laurence Gillooly
Bishop Laurence Gillooly C.M.
(born , died )
Bishop of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGallowstown, County Roscommon, Diocese of Elphin
Ordained BishopSt. Vincent de Paul, Chapel, Cork, Diocese of Cork
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Sligo, Diocese of Elphin

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 145, and Page 258
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 36
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 97, Number 8,275
  • ln/loc: CB, 16 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 17 May 2025