Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Duggan

Deceased

Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1813Born
5 Jun 184127.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 187157.8AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
14 Jan 187258.1Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
15 Aug 189682.7DiedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Duggan (VIAF: 315945354)
Bishop Patrick Duggan (born , died ) Bishop of Clonfert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMusiefeld
Ordained BishopSoeurs de misericorde, Chapel, Galway, Diocese of Galway
Death PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017