Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Crolly

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1780BornBallykilbeg
180625.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 182544.7AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
1 May 182544.8Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
8 May 183554.9AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
6 Apr 184968.8DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Crolly (VIAF: 10652326)
Archbishop William Crolly (born , died ) Archbishop of Armagh

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 90, and Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016