Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William O’Higgins

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1794BornBarraghbeg
20 Sep 181723.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 182935.1AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
30 Nov 182935.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
3 Jan 185358.4DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

MicroData Summary for William O’Higgins
Bishop William O’Higgins (born , died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1851
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 86
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 48
  • b/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016