Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne (Stefano) Missir

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1806BornIzmir, Turkey
16 Sep 183226.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 183730.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
12 Mar 183730.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
10 Dec 186357.5DiedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia

MicroData Summary for Etienne (Stefano) Missir
Bishop Etienne (Stefano) Missir (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1837, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Aug 2016