Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josif Sokolski

Deceased

Archbishop of Bulgarian United Church (Constantinople) (Bulgarian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1786²Born
1822²36.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 186074.9Converted
14 Apr 186175.2Ordained BishopArchbishop
19 Apr 186175.2AppointedArchbishop of Bulgarian United Church (Constantinople) (Bulgarian)
30 Sep 187993.7DiedArchbishop of Bulgarian United Church (Constantinople) (Bulgarian)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josif Sokolski (VIAF: 427145857926923020001)
Archbishop Josif Sokolski (born 1786, died ) Archbishop of Bulgarian United Church (Constantinople)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNova Mahala
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB, 16 Aug 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,861, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast