Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius Denvir

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1791Born
31 May 181422.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 183544.1AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
22 Nov 183544.2Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
4 May 186573.7ResignedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
10 Jul 186674.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Down and Connor, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Denvir (VIAF: 315945615)
Bishop Cornelius Denvir (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallywalter

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,531
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017